Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006051820 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002339526 | 22.11.2002 | JP0314946 | 21.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2004048975 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002339526 | 22.11.2002 | JP0314946 | 21.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003284643 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002339526 | 22.11.2002 | JP0314946 | 21.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1580557 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2006 | A4 | EP1580557 | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002339526 | 22.11.2002 | JP0314946 | 21.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004048975 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002339526 | 22.11.2002 |