EP1664094 - COMPOSITION FOR PROTECTING PROTEINS DEGRADATION COMPRISING SMALL HEAT SHOCK PROTEINS (SHSPS) AND METHOD OF TWO-DIMENSIONAL GEL ELECTROPHORESIS USING THE SHSPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/23] | COMPOSITION FOR PROTECTING PROTEINS DEGRADATION COMPRISING SMALL HEAT SHOCK PROTEINS (sHSPs) AND METHOD OF TWO-DIMENSIONAL GEL ELECTROPHORESIS USING THE sHSPs | ||
[2008/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1 Guseong-dong Yuseong-gu 305-338 Daejeon / KR | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang Yup EXPO.Apt 212-702 Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-761 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
HAN, Mee Jung 373-1, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-338 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
PARK, Si Jae 149-31 Pungnab 1- dong Songpa-gu 138-873 Seoul / KR | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03774298.8 | 24.11.2003 | [2006/23] | WO2003KR02539 | Priority number, date | KR20030062756 | 08.09.2003 Original published format: KR 2003062756 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023847 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664094 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664094 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C07K14/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEINE HITZESCHOCK PROTEINE (SHSPS) ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM SCHUTZ VOR PROTEINABBAU UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN GELELEKTROPHORESE UNTER ANWENDUNG DER SHSPS | [2006/23] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PROTECTING PROTEINS DEGRADATION COMPRISING SMALL HEAT SHOCK PROTEINS (SHSPS) AND METHOD OF TWO-DIMENSIONAL GEL ELECTROPHORESIS USING THE SHSPS | [2008/46] | French: | COMPOSITION DESTINEE A PROTEGER LES PROTEINES CONTRE UNE DEGRADATION ET COMPRENANT DE PETITES PROTEINES DE CHOC THERMIQUE (SHSP), ET PROCEDE D'ELECTROPHORESE SUR GEL EN DEUX DIMENSIONS UTILISANT LES SHSP | [2006/23] |
Former [2006/23] | COMPOSITION FOR PROTECTING PROTEINS DEGRADATION COMPRISING SMALL HEAT SHOCK PROTEINS (sHSPs) AND METHOD OF TWO-DIMENSIONAL GEL ELECTROPHORESIS USING THE sHSPs | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2008 | BE | 12.11.2008 | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IT | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | RO | 12.11.2008 | SI | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | IE | 24.11.2008 | LU | 24.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | BG | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | HU | 13.05.2009 | [2014/32] |
Former [2010/49] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CY | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
TR | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CY | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
TR | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CY | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0599344 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 1 - column 4; claims 1-7,11,12 * [Y] 7-15; | [XY]WO0179250 (UNIV MARYLAND BIOTECH INST [US]) [X] 1-6 * example 3 * [Y] 7-15; | [XY]WO03057897 (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY LAB EMBL [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * example 10 * [Y] 7-15; | [XY] - SKYLAS DJ ET AL., "The wheat-grain proteome as a basis for more efficient cultivar identification", PROTEOMICS, (200112), vol. 1, no. 12, ISSN 1615-9853, pages 1542 - 1546, XP002394229 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1615-9861(200111)1:12<1542::AID-PROT1542>3.0.CO;2-K | [T] - HAN M-J ET AL., "Enhanced Proteome Profiling by Inhibiting Proteolysis with Small Heat Shock Proteins", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (200511), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1535-3893, pages 2429 - 2434, XP002394230 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/pr050259m | International search | [A]US6139841 (SRIVASTAVA PRAMOD K [US]); | [Y] - SHEARSTONE J.R. ET AL., "Biochemical characterization of the small heat shock protein IbpB from Escherichia coli", J.BIOL.CHEM., (19990409), vol. 274, no. 15, pages 9937 - 9945, XP008066001 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.15.9937 | [Y] - KITAGAWA, M. ET AL., "Escherichia coli small heat shock proteins, IbpB, protect enzymes from inactivation by heat and oxidants", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2002), vol. 269, page 2907, XP002995476 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1033.2002.02958.x | [Y] - NAGATA, Y. ET AL., "The stabilization mechanism of mutant-type p53 by impaired ubiquitination: the loss of wild-type p53 function and the hsp90 association", ONCOGENE, (1999), vol. 18, no. 44, pages 6037 - 6049, XP008066002 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1202978 | [Y] - MUENCHBACH, M. ET AL., "Multiple small heat shock proteins in rhizobia", J. BACTERIOL., (1999), vol. 181, no. 1, pages 83 - 90, XP008066000 | Examination | - HAN M-J ET AL., "Enhanced Proteome Profiling by Inhibiting Proteolysis with Small Heat Shock Proteins", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (20051021), vol. 4, pages 2429 - 2434 | - FINNIE C & SVENSSON B, "Proteolysis during the isoelectric focusing step of two-dimensional gel electrophoresis may be a common problem", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 311, pages 182 - 186 |