EP1549493 - BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYOLEFIN FILM FOR COLD SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY PLASTICS (AMERICA), INC. 50 Belver Avenue North Kingstown, RI 02582-7500 / US | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Mark, S. 50 Belver Street N. Kingstown, RI 02852-7500 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Keunsuk, P. 31 Mayflower Court N. Kingstown, RI 02852 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03774619.5 | 06.10.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US31732 | Priority number, date | US20020415757P | 04.10.2002 Original published format: US 415757 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033205 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549493 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549493 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, C08J7/12 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B37/153 (US);
B32B38/0008 (US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C08J7/06 (US);
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0092 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/242 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,US);
B32B2310/14 (US);
B32B2311/24 (US);
B32B2323/00 (EP,US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2439/40 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
C08J2323/00 (EP,US);
C08J2323/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [2006/04] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BIAXIAL ORIENTIERTER POLYOLEFINFILM FÜR KALTSIEGELANWENDUNGEN | [2005/27] | English: | BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYOLEFIN FILM FOR COLD SEAL | [2005/27] | French: | FILM POLYOLEFINIQUE ORIENTE BIAXIALEMENT POUR SOUDURE PAR PRESSION A FROID | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2013
13.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Besier, Thomas, et al, et al Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 64 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2013
Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Besier, Thomas, et al, et al Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte /Steuerberater / Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F. Kennedy-Strasse 4 D-65198 Wiesbaden / DE | 12.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.02.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.02.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.09.2012 | IT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | [2013/37] |
Former [2013/22] | BE | 05.09.2012 | |
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 05.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5482780 (WILKIE ANDREW F [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * claims 1,7,9-11 * * column 4, line 18 - line 31 ** column 5, line 34 - line 56 *; | [X]WO0206043 (TORAY PLASTICS AMERICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-13,15,16,21 * * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 18 * * example 1 *; | [PX]WO03066324 (TORAY PLASTICS AMERICA INC [US]) [PX] 1-16 * claims 1-9,11-14 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 9 - line 17 * * examples 1,3 *; | [PX]WO03072353 (TORAY PLASTICS AMERICA INC [US]) [PX] 1-9,11-14 * claims 1,3,6-10,13,15,16,18,21,24 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 9 * * examples 1,3 * |