EP1556440 - OLIGOMERS FROM MULTIFUNCTIONAL ACRYLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ashland Licensing and Intellectual Property LLC 5200 Blazer Parkway Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Ashland Inc. 50 E. RiverCenter Boulevard Covington, Kentucky 41012-0391 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERIDAN, Matthew, S. 49 Spicewood Land Powell, OH 43065 / US | 02 /
DAMMANN, Laurence, G. 2437 Wyndblend Boulevard Powell, OH 43065 / US | 03 /
NARAYAN-SARATHY, Sridevi 5306 Sutter Home Road Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | [2005/44] |
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
SHERIDAN, Matthew, S. 49 Spicewood Land Powell, OH 43065 / US | ||
02 /
DAMMANN, Laurence, G. 2437 Wyndblend Boulevard Powell, OH 43065 / US | Representative(s) | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Bülle, Jan, et al Patentanwälte Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03774833.2 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US32643 | Priority number, date | US20020269947 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: US 269947 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004035632 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1556440 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F22/10 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
C08F22/1006 (EP,US);
B05D3/065 (KR);
B05D7/24 (KR);
C08F2/44 (KR);
C08F2/50 (KR);
B05D2508/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | C08L61/00, C08F283/00, C08G6/00, C07C69/72, C07C69/73, C07C69/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | 04.05.2005 | LT | 04.05.2005 | LV | 04.05.2005 | MK | 04.05.2005 | Title | German: | OLIGOMERE VON MULTIFUNKTIONELLEN ACRYLATEN | [2005/30] | English: | OLIGOMERS FROM MULTIFUNCTIONAL ACRYLATES | [2005/30] | French: | OLIGOMERES D'ACRYLATES MULTIFONCTIONNELS | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4338239 (DAMMANN LAURENCE G); | [YP]US2003073757 (MOY THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al); | [AE]US6673851 (MOY THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y] - MCMURRY J., Organic chemistry, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BROOKS/COLE PUBLISHING CO., A DIVISION OF WADSWORTH, INC., (1988), page 841, ISBN 0-534-07968-7, XP002977549 |