EP1559164 - PROTON-CONDUCTING POLYMER MEMBRANE CONTAINING POLYAZOLE BLENDS, AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Fuel Cell Research GmbH Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2010/42] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states BASF Fuel Cell GmbH Industriepark Höchst 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Pemeas GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENSAL, Oemer Südring 387 55128 Mainz / DE | 02 /
KIEFER, Joachim Scheidener Strasse 2 66679 Losheim am See / DE | 03 /
CALUNDANN, Gordon 1275 Rock Avenue North Plainfield, NJ 07060 / US | 04 /
SANSONE, Michael 73 Cornell Avenue Berkeley Heights, NJ 07927 / US | 05 /
BENICEWICZ, Brian 19 Loudon Heights North Loudonville, NY 12211 / US | 06 /
CHOE, Eui, Won 130 Radtke Road Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | [2006/42] |
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
UENSAL, Oemer Südring 387 55128 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
KIEFER, Joachim Scheidener Strasse 2 66679 Losheim am See / DE | |||
03 /
CALUNDANN, Gordon 1275 Rock Avenue North Plainfield, NJ 07060 / US | |||
04 /
SANSONE, Michael 73 Cornell Avenue Berkeley Heights, NJ 07927 / US | |||
05 /
BENICEWICZ, Brian 19 Loudon Heights North Loudonville, NY 12211 / US | |||
06 /
CHOE, Eui, Wong 130 Radtke Road Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Luderschmidt, Wolfgang, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte Industriepark Höchst, Gebäude F 821 65926 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, Industriepark Höchst, Geb. F821 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 03775168.2 | 02.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003EP10905 | Priority number, date | DE20021046461 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10246461 | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004034500 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1559164 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559164 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10, B01D67/00, C08J5/22 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C08J5/2275 (EP,US);
C08J5/22 (KR);
B01D71/62 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/18 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/10 (KR);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1025 (EP,US);
H01M8/1027 (EP,US);
H01M8/103 (EP,US);
H01M8/1032 (EP,US);
H01M8/1034 (EP,US);
H01M8/1037 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1041 (EP,US);
H01M8/1048 (EP,US);
H01M8/1072 (EP,US);
H01M8/1081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Title | German: | PROTONENLEITENDE POLYMERMEMBRAN ENTHALTEND POLYAZOLBLENDS UND DEREN ANWENDUNG IN BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | [2005/31] | English: | PROTON-CONDUCTING POLYMER MEMBRANE CONTAINING POLYAZOLE BLENDS, AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN FUEL CELLS | [2005/31] | French: | MEMBRANE POLYMERE CONDUCTRICE DE PROTONS CONTENANT DES MELANGES DE POLYAZOLES, ET SON UTILISATION DANS DES PILES A COMBUSTIBLE | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2003 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | AT | 02.10.2013 | IE | 02.10.2013 | LU | 02.10.2013 | GB | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 02.10.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 02.10.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 02.10.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 17.07.2013 | |
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 18.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0354040 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1-24 * example - *; | [X]US5098985 (HARRIS WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1,12,14-16,18,20-22* examples 39,52 *; | [A]WO0027513 (AXIVA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-29 * example - *; | [A]US6248469 (FORMATO RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * examples 9,10,12,13 *; | [A]WO0194450 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * examples 6-11 *; | [A]WO0236249 (CELANESE VENTURES GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-29 * example - * | Examination | WO0118894 | by applicant | US3692569 | US4453991 | US4634530 | US4997892 | US5422411 | EP0667983 | WO9601177 | WO9613872 | US5525436 | DE19527435 | US5635041 | US5834523 | DE19844645 | DE19817374 | EP0960117 | WO0015691 | US6110616 | WO0118894 | DE19959289 | - F. KUCERA, POLYMER ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 38, no. 5, pages 783 - 792 | - J. MEMBR. SCI., (1993), vol. 83, page 211 | - P. STAITI, J. MEMBR. SCI., (2001), vol. 188, page 71 | - SANUI ET AL., POLYM. ADV. TECHN., (2000), vol. 11, page 544 | - K.-D. KREUER, "Vehicle-Mechanismus", CHEM. MATER., (1996), vol. 8, pages 610 - 641 | - J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 142, no. 7, pages L121 - L123 | - K.-D. KREUER, CHEM. MATER., (1996), vol. 8, pages 610 - 641 | - N. J. BJERRUM, JOURNAL OF APPLIED ELECTROCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 31, pages 773 - 779 | - GANG, XIAO; HJULER, H. A.; OLSEN, C.; BERG, R. W.; BJERRUM, N. J., "Chem. Dep. A, Tech. Univ. Denmark, Lyngby", DEN. J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 140, no. 4, pages 896 - 902 | - RAZAQ, M.; RAZAQ, A.; YEAGER, E.; DESMARTEAU, DARRYL D.; SINGH, S., "Case Cent. Electrochem. Sci., Case West. Reserve Univ., Cleveland, OH, USA", J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 136, no. 2, pages 385 - 90 | DE19924219077 |