EP1579017 - METHOD FOR TREATING SLAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outokumpu Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNIALA, Pekka Runkotie 1 D FIN-02730 Espoo / FI | 02 /
KOJO, Ilkka Kaksosmäki 11 C 9 FIN-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | 03 /
SAARINEN, Risto Niittykuja 2 A 25 FIN-02210 Espoo / FI | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03775423.1 | 24.11.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003FI00898 | Priority number, date | FI20020002150 | 05.12.2002 Original published format: FI 20022150 | [2005/39] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004050925 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579017 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22B7/04 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
C22B15/0054 (EP,US);
C22B7/04 (KR);
C22B15/0047 (EP,US);
C22B7/006 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHLACKE | [2005/39] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING SLAG | [2005/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SCORIES | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 10.01.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3632308 (KLEIN LAWRENCE C, et al); | [X]DE2348005 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON); | [A]US4484730 (DIMITROV ISSAY M [BG], et al); | [A]WO0149890 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al); | [XP]CA2363969 (CURLOOK WALTER [CA], et al) |