EP1590039 - AN ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND A SYSTEM WITH IMPEDANCE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/44] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUEHLSTAFFF, Jens c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
REITER, Harald c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MONTVAY, Andras c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LAUTER, Josef c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
SUCH, Olaf c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
SCHMIDT, Ralf c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
PERKUHN, Michael c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 08 /
KOHLER, Fabian c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03775622.8 | 24.11.2003 | [2005/44] | WO2003IB05481 | Priority number, date | EP20020080431 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02080431 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004056418 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590039 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A61N1/0492 (EP,US);
A61N1/046 (EP,US);
A61N1/0476 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND EIN IMPEDANZKONTROLLSYSTEM | [2005/44] | English: | AN ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND A SYSTEM WITH IMPEDANCE CONTROL | [2005/44] | French: | ENSEMBLE ELECTRODE ET SYSTEME A REGULATION D'IMPEDANCE | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6032060 (CARIM HATIM M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 31; figure - *; | [A]US5846558 (NIELSEN KENT E [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 29; figure - *; | [A]US5038796 (AXELGAARD JENS [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 53; figure - *; | [A]US4850356 (HEATH ROGER L [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 45 - column 9, line 63; figure - * |