EP1576643 - HIGH-PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/38] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOELLER, Klaus, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
WESTEMEYER, Manfred, Philips I. P. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
HENAUX, Manfred, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 04 /
KNIGHT, Colette, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 05 /
MERCIER, Virgine, Marie, Marguerite Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH, Weisshausstr.2 52066 Aachen / DE | 06 /
HENDRIKS, Rene, Jan Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH, Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03775754.9 | 10.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003IB05884 | Priority number, date | EP20020102778 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02102778 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004055859 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1576643 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H01J61/34 (EP,KR,US);
H01J61/04 (KR);
H01J61/18 (KR);
H01J61/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKENTLADUNGSLAMPE | [2005/38] | English: | HIGH-PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP | [2005/38] | French: | LAMPE A DECHARGE HAUTE PRESSION | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2001307677 ; | [Y]DE8600642U (N.V. PHILIPS GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 7 * * page 5, line 4 *; | [Y]WO0120641 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 10-12 * abstract ** claim 5 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001307677 A 20011102 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1,3,5 * * claims 1-4 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0018] * |