EP1688630 - BUSH BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OILES CORPORATION 30-5, Hamamatsu-cho 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8584 / JP | [2009/12] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states OILES CORPORATION 30-5, Hamamatsu-cho 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8584 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJI, Kohachi, @c/o OILES CORPORATION Shiga Plant 1118, Deba Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3041 / JP | 02 /
MAKINAE, Yuzo, @c/o OILES CORPORATION Shiga Plant 1118, Deba Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3041 / JP | 03 /
KAJIWARA, Shigeru, @c/o OILES CORPORATION Toyota Branch 2-31-1, Tsuchihashi-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0824 / JP | [2015/26] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
TSUJI, Kohachi, c/o OILES CORPORATION Shiga Plant 1118, Deba Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3041 / JP | ||
02 /
MAKINAE, Yuzo, c/o OILES CORPORATION Shiga Plant 1118, Deba Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3041 / JP | |||
03 /
KAJIWARA, Shigeru, c/o OILES CORPORATION Toyota Branch, 2-31-1, Tsuchihashi-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0824 / JP | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2015/26] |
Former [2008/29] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/32] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03775877.8 | 25.11.2003 | [2006/32] | WO2003JP15017 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052394 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688630 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688630 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1688630 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/02, F16C33/14, F16C35/00, // F16C33/08, F16C33/20, F16C35/02 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
F16C33/08 (EP,US);
F16C17/02 (EP,US);
F16C33/046 (EP,US);
F16C33/206 (EP,US);
F16C33/208 (EP,US);
F16C35/02 (EP,US);
F16C2202/10 (EP,US);
F16C2204/10 (EP,US);
F16C2220/20 (EP,US);
F16C2220/44 (EP,US);
F16C2223/30 (EP,US);
F16C2226/12 (EP,US);
F16C2240/70 (EP,US);
F16C23/088 (EP,US);
Y10S384/902 (EP,US);
Y10S384/912 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | F16C17/02, F16C33/08, F16C33/20, F16C35/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/26] |
Former [2007/09] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BUCHSENLAGER | [2006/32] | English: | BUSH BEARING | [2006/32] | French: | PALIER LISSE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2006 | Translation filed | 01.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 11.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2009
10.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Achler, Matthias, et al, et al Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bahnhofstrasse 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | 02
18.12.2009
28.01.2010
ADMISSIBLE KS Gleitlager GmbH Am Bahnhof 14 68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE Opponent's representative DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2009
10.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Achler, Matthias, et al, et al Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstr. 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02
18.12.2009
28.01.2010
ADMISSIBLE KS Gleitlager GmbH Am Bahnhof 14 68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE Opponent's representative Dreiss, et al, et al Patentanwälte Gerokstraße 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2012/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2009
10.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Achler, Matthias, et al, et al Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstr. 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02
18.12.2009
28.01.2010
ADMISSIBLE KS Gleitlager GmbH Am Bahnhof 14 68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE Opponent's representative Friz, Oliver, et al, et al Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2010/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2009
Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Achler, Matthias, et al, et al Fuchs Patentanwälte Söhnleinstraße 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02
18.12.2009
KS Gleitlager GmbH Am Bahnhof 14 68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE Opponent's representative Friz, Oliver, et al, et al Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | 05.02.2010 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 04.03.2010 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 11.03.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.09.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.12.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.05.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.02.2013 | Appeal received No. T0304/13 | 11.04.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.12.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 02.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10135588 (SKF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS59212508 (SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO); | [Y]JPS61115625 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001132756 (NIPPON DIA CLEVITE CO); | [Y]US2002025095 (BRANDENSTEIN MANFRED [DE], et al) | Opposition | DE2940685 | DE3908026 | - DIN ISO 3547-1 | - DIN ISO 3547-4 |