EP1573560 - System and method for efficient use of bandwidth or reduction of time accuracy requirements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/37] | SCHEMATIZING OF MESSAGES IN DISTRIBUTED CONTROL AND SUPERVISION SYSTEM | ||
[2010/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xinshu Management L.L.C. 160 Greentree Drive, Suite 101 Dover, DE 19904 / US | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states TimeGalactic AB Box 4 511 21 Kinna / SE | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states KVASER CONSULTANT AB Aminogatan 25A 431 53 Mölndal / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDRIKSSON, Lars-Berno Berggränd 1 S-511 00 Kinna / SE | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Thielemann, Torge Jan, et al Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10/II 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03776106.1 | 11.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003SE01736 | Priority number, date | SE20020003756 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: SE 0203756 | [2005/37] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055682 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573560 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573560 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/376, G06F1/14 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G06F13/3625 (EP,US);
G06F1/14 (EP,US);
H04J3/0658 (EP,US);
H04L12/40013 (US);
H04L12/403 (EP,US);
H04L12/4135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur effizienten Nutzung der Bandbreite oder der Reduzierung der Zeit Genauigkeitsanforderungen | [2010/16] | English: | System and method for efficient use of bandwidth or reduction of time accuracy requirements | [2010/16] | French: | Système et procédé pour l'utilisation efficace de la bande passante ou la réduction des exigences de précision d'horloge | [2010/16] |
Former [2005/37] | SCHEMATISIEREN VON NACHRICHTEN IN EINEM ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT VERTEILTER STEUERUNG | ||
Former [2005/37] | SCHEMATIZING OF MESSAGES IN DISTRIBUTED CONTROL AND SUPERVISION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2005/37] | SCHEMATISATION DE MESSAGES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMANDE ET DE SUPERVISION DISTRIBUE | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2003 | Translation filed | 08.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | BE | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0187679 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [X]US4719620 (MACHINO KATSUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]WO9502294 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]); | [Y]WO0133780 (NET INSIGHT AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0176148 (KVASER CONSULTANT AB [SE], et al) |