EP1572099 - SCREENING AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS RELATING TO NEUROGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Qun-Yong 42 Harvey Court Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Michelle, Y. 5202 Palo Verde Road Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Weber-Quitzau, Martin, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03776235.8 | 03.10.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US31626 | Priority number, date | US20020416202P | 04.10.2002 Original published format: US 416202 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004032851 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1572099 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C07K14/47 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | G01N33/556, G01N33/68 | ||
Former IPC [2005/37] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCREENING UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER NEUROGENESE | [2005/37] | English: | SCREENING AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS RELATING TO NEUROGENESIS | [2005/37] | French: | CRIBLAGE ET PROCEDES THERAPEUTIQUES LIES A LA NEUROGENESE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0236625 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * claims 42-44 *; | [A] - BULLOCK C M ET AL, "Identification of two prokineticin cDNAs: Recombinant proteins potently contract gastrointestinal smooth muscle", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, 31ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; NOVEMBER 10-15, 2001, (2001), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 0190-5295, page 2226, XP002406497 [A] 1-35 * abstract * | International search | [YP]US2002165380 (BARD JONATHAN A [US]); | [YE]US2003203847 (ROSENFELD JULIE BETH [US], et al); | [XE]US2004229291 (ZHOU QUN-YONG [US], et al) |