EP1556967 - POWER CONTROL FOR COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS UTILIZING HIGH SPEED SHARED CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | 30.01.2015 | Change - no opposition filed | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | 30.01.2015 | Change - inventor | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICK, Stephen, G. 61 Bobann Drive Nesconset, NY 11767 / US | 02 /
RUDOLF, Marian 1843 rue Baile Montreal, QC H3H 1P5 / CA | [2015/10] |
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
DICK, Stephen, G. 61 Bobann Drive Nesconset, NY 11767 / US | ||
02 /
RUDOLF, Marian 2046 Rue de la Visitation Montreal, Québec H2L 3C7 / CA | Representative(s) | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03776425.5 | 16.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US32715 | Priority number, date | US20020419380P | 17.10.2002 Original published format: US 419380 P | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036809 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1556967 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1556967 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
H04W52/0238 (EP,US);
H04W52/0245 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/54 (US);
H04L1/1607 (US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W52/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/14 (KR);
H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/221 (US);
H04W52/241 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/265 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/267 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/325 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSREGELUNG FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME MIT SCHNELLEN GEMEINSAM BENUTZTEN KANÄLEN | [2005/30] | English: | POWER CONTROL FOR COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS UTILIZING HIGH SPEED SHARED CHANNELS | [2005/30] | French: | COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DE SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION UTILISANT DES CANAUX PARTAGES A HAUT DEBIT | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP09167162.8 / EP2117130 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2009 | BE | 05.08.2009 | CY | 05.08.2009 | CZ | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | IT | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | IE | 16.10.2009 | LU | 16.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | ES | 16.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 16.10.2009 | ||
LU | 16.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 16.10.2009 | ||
LU | 16.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 16.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 16.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0241522 (EVOLIUM SAS [FR], et al) [X] 1-38 * abstract *; | [X]WO02065667 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 7, line 20 - page 10, line 20; figure 3 * * page 12, line 22 - line 29; claims 1,12 *; | [X]US2002136192 (HOLMA HARRI [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046]; claim 9 ** paragraph [0074] * | International search | [A]US6108374 (BALACHANDRAN KRISHNA [US], et al); | [A]US6154659 (JALALI AHMAD [US], et al); | [A]US6181738 (CHHEDA ASHVIN [US], et al) |