EP1576592 - DISC DRIVE WITH IMPROVED RESISTANCE AGAINST MECHANICAL SHOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yu c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Uittenbogaard, Frank, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03777106.0 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003IB06027 | Priority number, date | WO2002SG00304 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: PCT/SG0200/304 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004057584 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1576592 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G11B7/0946 (EP,US);
G11B7/0925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENLAUFWERK MIT VERBESSERTEM WIDERSTAND GEGEN MECHANISCHE STÖSSEN | [2005/38] | English: | DISC DRIVE WITH IMPROVED RESISTANCE AGAINST MECHANICAL SHOCKS | [2005/38] | French: | LECTEUR DE DISQUES PRESENTANT UNE RESISTANCE ACCRUE AUX CHOCS MECANIQUES | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0205271 (DISCCONTROL APS UNDER STIFTELS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document * [Y] 8-15; | [YA]EP0798704 (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [Y] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [E]WO03107335 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1 * abstract * * page 6, line 9 - page 10, line 12 * | [Y] - JIA-YUSH YEN, KURT HALLAMASEK, ROBERTO HOROWITZ, "Track-Following Controller Design for a Compound Disk Drive Actuator", JOURNAL OF DYNAMIC SYSTEMS, MEASUREMENT, AND CONTROL, USA, (199009), vol. 112, no. 3, pages 391 - 402, XP008031105 [Y] 8-10,12-15 * the whole document * |