EP1576890 - FOOD CONTAINING SWEETENER MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUSHO 4-8, Koraibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8543 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUSHO 4-8, Koraibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Ryuzo 10-27, Nango-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0038 / JP | 02 /
HONDA, Junya, 502, Nishinomiyanajio- Windyhills-miharashinooka, 2-29, Higashiyamadai Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 669-1133 / JP | 03 /
KASHIWAGI, Satoshi 3-15-8, Mukonosohonmachi Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0031 / JP | 04 /
MASUDA, Takashi 5-28-14-102, Kamiya Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1216 / JP | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03777178.9 | 02.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003JP15433 | Priority number, date | JP20020366594 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002366594 | JP20030149558 | 27.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003149558 | [2005/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054385 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1576890 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/22 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
A23L27/34 (EP,US);
A23L27/00 (KR);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/628, A23V2250/6416 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTEL MIT SÜSSSTOFFMISCHUNG | [2005/38] | English: | FOOD CONTAINING SWEETENER MIXTURE | [2005/38] | French: | ALIMENT CONTENANT UN MELANGE EDULCORANT | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2005 | Translation filed | 01.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 24.10.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS60168364 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]DE2703396 (INDIANA UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION); | [X]JPS4954572 ; | [Y]EP0390299 |