EP1558482 - COMBINED TAILGATE AND ENGINE COVER HINGED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07675-8738 / US | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBRIGHT, Larry, E. 162 Maplewood Drive Gwinner, ND 58040 / US | 02 /
FREDERICK, Dan, A. 464 South 4th Street Forman, ND 58032 / US | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03777825.5 | 24.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US33620 | Priority number, date | US20020287160 | 04.11.2002 Original published format: US 287160 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004041624 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558482 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558482 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/10, B60J5/10, E02F9/08, B60P1/50 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B60J5/108 (EP,US);
B62D25/10 (EP,US);
B62D33/027 (EP,US);
E02F3/3414 (EP,US);
E02F9/0833 (EP,US);
E02F9/0866 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/45] |
Former [2005/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATION EINER HINTEREN TÜR UND EINER DARAN VERSCHWENKBAREN MOTORHAUBE | [2005/31] | English: | COMBINED TAILGATE AND ENGINE COVER HINGED THERETO | [2005/31] | French: | COMBINAISON DE PANNEAU ARRIERE ET DE CAPOT MOTEUR ARTICULE AU PANNEAU ARRIERE | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 07.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4090579 (STEDMAN ROBERT N) [X] 1,3,4-6 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 15; figure 1; claim 4 * * column 1, lines 55-58; figure 2 * [A] 2,7-9,11; | [A]US6416112 (TRIVITS CHARLES R [US]) [A] 7-11,10 * column 3, lines 36-54 * * figure 2; claim 5 *; | [A]EP1079030 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 7-11 * the whole document * |