EP1575609 - METHODS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTION USING IL-28 AND IL-29 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, L.L.C. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, L.L.C. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | ||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | ||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUCHER, Kevin, M. 5308 135th Place SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 02 /
SIVAKUMAR, Pallavur V. 7107 32nd Avenue NW Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 03 /
KINDSVOGEL, Wayne, R. 6014 24th Avenue NE Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 04 /
HENDERSON, Katherine, E. 4851 26th Avenue SW Seattle, WA 98106 / US | [2007/14] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
KLUCHER, Kevin, M. 5308 135th Place SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | ||
02 /
SIVAKUMAR, Pallavur V. 2644 NW 63rd Street Seattle, WA 98107 / US | |||
03 /
KINDSVOGEL, Wayne, R. 6014 24th Avenue NE Seattle, WA 98115 / US | |||
04 /
HENDERSON, Katherine, E. 5046 1/2 22nd Avenue NE Seattle, WA 98105 / US | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03777830.5 | 23.10.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003US33628 | Priority number, date | US20020420714P | 23.10.2002 Original published format: US 420714 P | US20020420713P | 23.10.2002 Original published format: US 420713 P | US20030463939P | 18.04.2003 Original published format: US 463939 P | US20030463982P | 18.04.2003 Original published format: US 463982 P | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004037995 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1575609 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/21, A61K39/29, A61K38/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K38/20 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K14/54 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VIRUSINFEKTIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON IL-28 UND IL-29 | [2005/38] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTION USING IL-28 AND IL-29 | [2005/38] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTION VIRALE A L'AIDE DE IL-28 ET IL-29 | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 02.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 14.08.2009 | [2009/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0202627 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * Whole document, especially page 41, lines 14-20 *; | [IP]WO02086087 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [IP] 1-22 * Whole document, especially page 49, lines 26-30 and page 50 lines 27-33 *; | [A] - CAR B D ET AL, "THE TOXICOLOGY OF INTERLEUKIN-12: A REVIEW", TOXICOLOGIC PATHOLOGY, SOCIETY OF TOXICOLOGIC PATHOLOGISTS, LAWRENCE, KS, US, (19990101), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0192-6233, pages 58 - 63, XP009024657 [A] 1-22 * abstract * | [IP] - SHEPPARD PAUL ET AL, "IL-28, IL-29 and their class II cytokine receptor IL-28R", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NI873, (20021202), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 63 - 68, XP002261756 [IP] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni873 | [IP] - KOTENKO S V ET AL, "IFN-LAMBDAS MEDIATE ANTIVIRAL PROTECTION THROUGH A DISTINCT CLASS II CYTOKINE RECEPTOR COMPLEX", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NI875, (20021216), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 69 - 77, XP008040607 [IP] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni875 | [A] - ARTILLO S ET AL, "Double-blind, randomized controlled trial of interleukin-2 treatment of chronic hepatitis B.", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL VIROLOGY MAR 1998 LNKD- PUBMED:9580313, (199803), vol. 54, no. 3, ISSN 0146-6615, pages 167 - 172, XP002607976 [A] 1-22 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2002039763 (SHEPPARD PAUL O [US], et al); | [A]WO02086087 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]); | [A]US2003104416 (SHEPPARD PAUL O [US], et al); | [A]WO03066002 (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US], et al); | [A]WO03089603 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]); | [A]US2004029228 (PRESNELL SCOTT R [US], et al); | [A]US2004138122 (KLUCHER KEVIN M [US], et al); | [A] - KOTENKO S.V. ET AL., "IFN-lambdas mediate antiviral protection through a distinct class II cytokine receptor complex", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, (200301), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 69 - 77, XP008040607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni875 | [A] - SHEPPARD P. ET AL., "IL-28, IL-29 and their class II cytokine receptor IL-28R", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, (200301), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 63 - 68, XP002261756 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni873 | [A] - LANGER J.A., "The class II cytokine receptor (CRF2) family: overview and patterns of receptor-ligand interactions", CYTOKINE AND GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 15, pages 33 - 48, XP002985227 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cytogfr.2003.10.001 | [A] - DONNELLY R.P. ET AL., "The expanded family of class II cytokines that share the IL-10 receptor-2 (IL-10R2)chain", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (200408), vol. 76, pages 314 - 321, XP008045024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.0204117 | [A] - DUMOUTIER L. ET AL., "Role of the interleukin (IL)-28 receptor tyrosine residues for antiviral and antiproliferative activity of IL-29/interferon-lambda1", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (200407), vol. 279, no. 31, pages 32269 - 32274, XP002985228 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M404789200 |