EP1561102 - USE OF TEMPERATURE AND FLOW PROFILES IN GRADIENT ELUTION BASED ANALYTICAL PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian, Inc. 3120 Hansen Way, D-102 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEEHAN, Terry, L. 1641 Carriage Drive Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen, Macara & Co., 6-8 Swakeleys Road, Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03777995.6 | 29.10.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003US34442 | Priority number, date | US20020422465P | 30.10.2002 Original published format: US 422465 P | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004042384 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561102 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561102 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/72, B01D15/08 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
G01N30/34 (EP,US);
G01N30/7266 (EP,US);
G01N30/7273 (EP,US);
Y10T436/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON TEMPERATUR- UND STRÖMUNGSPROFILEN BEI ANALYTISCHEN PROZESSEN AUF GRADIENTENELUTIONSBASIS | [2005/32] | English: | USE OF TEMPERATURE AND FLOW PROFILES IN GRADIENT ELUTION BASED ANALYTICAL PROCESS | [2005/32] | French: | UTILISATION DE PROFILS D'ECOULEMENT ET DE TEMPERATURE DANS UN PROCESSUS ANALYTIQUE BASE SUR UNE ELUTION GRADUEE | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 19.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.2009 | BE | 22.07.2009 | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | IT | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | IE | 29.10.2009 | LU | 29.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.10.2009 | ||
LU | 29.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.10.2009 | ||
LU | 29.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4814612 (VESTAL MARVIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * figures 1-3; claim - *; | [X]US4958529 (VESTAL MARVIN L [US]) [X] 1-22 * column 14, line 28 - column 15, line 16; figures 3,5; claims 17-19 *; | [A]US5412208 (COVEY THOMAS R [CA], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 25; figure 2; claim - *; | [A]US6339218 (KATO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 11, line 3 - line 17; claim - *; | [PA]US6484560 (PREST HARRY F [US]) [PA] 1-22* column 7, line 32 - line 47; figures 2A-2C * |