EP1555954 - MOUTH RINSE AND SPRAY NOZZLE FOR CREATING A LIQUID JET AND TEETH-CLEANING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2005/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROMER, Oswald Stuttgarter Ring 78 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
KRAMP, Andreas Hopfenstrasse 23c 65520 Bad Camberg / DE | 03 /
SAUER, Michael Kiefernweg 3 65520 Bad Camberg / DE | 04 /
STOLPER, Michael Neugasse 9a 65760 Eschborn / DE | 05 /
SCHAEFER, Norbert Im Trutz Frankfurt 13 60322 Frankfurt / DE | 06 /
HERZOG, Karl Marquardstrasse 29 60489 Frankfurt / DE | [2005/30] | Application number, filing date | 03778276.0 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003EP11431 | Priority number, date | DE2002148336 | 17.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10248336 | DE2002148338 | 17.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10248338 | DE2002148339 | 17.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10248339 | [2005/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004034923 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555954 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555954 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/02, B05B1/34, F04B49/12 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
F04B49/126 (EP,US);
A61C1/0092 (EP,US);
A61C17/0202 (EP,US);
B05B1/00 (EP,US);
B05B1/3421 (EP,US);
B05B1/3436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDDUSCHE UND SPRÜHDÜSE ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRAHLS SOWIE ZAHNREINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2005/30] | English: | MOUTH RINSE AND SPRAY NOZZLE FOR CREATING A LIQUID JET AND TEETH-CLEANING SYSTEM | [2005/30] | French: | DOUCHE BUCCALE ET BUSE DE PULVERISATION POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN JET DE LIQUIDE ET SYSTEME DE NETTOYAGE DE DENTS | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | IE | 14.04.2010 | IT | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 21.04.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | AT | 15.10.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | LU | 15.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
LU | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
LU | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2746453 (WAGNER J AG) [X] 22-24 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP0066930 (LPA LES PRODUITS ASSOCIES [CH]) [X] 1,7,22,24,25 * page 8, line 8 - page 10, line 3; figures 2,3,5-8 *; | [A]US4770632 (RYDER FRANCIS E [US], et al) [A] 7,9,12 * column 12, line 61 - column 13, line 28 *; | [X]US5711488 (LUND MARK T [US]) [X] 1-6,22-27 * column 1, line 21 - line 25; figure 3 * * column 1, line 45 - line 57 * * column 4, line 36 - line 61 *; | [DX]DE19959188 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1,3,7,8 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1312418 (STEAG MICROPARTS GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-6,22-25* column 13, line 11 - line 29 * |