EP1558720 - ANTI-CREASING COMPOSITION COMPRISING A COPOLYMER HAVING A CONTROLLED ARCHITECTURE, FOR ITEMS CONSISTING OF TEXTILE FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 26, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92512 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRISON, Ian 69 avenue Georges Berteaux F-78300 POISSY / FR | 02 /
DESTARAC, Mathias 64 boulevard du Port-Royal F-75005 PARIS / FR | 03 /
GEFFROY, Cédric Résidence de la Porte de Paris 1 Impasse de la Petite Villette F-86000 POITIERS / FR | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Boittiaux, Vincent, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Boittiaux, Vincent, et al Rhodia Services, DPI, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03778466.7 | 27.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003FR03183 | Priority number, date | FR20020013950 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0213950 | [2005/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044114 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558720 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558720 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D1/62, C11D3/00 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C11D3/3773 (EP,US);
C08F293/005 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D3/37 (EP,US);
C08F2438/03 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2393 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COPOLYMER MIT EINER KONTROLLIERTEN ARCHITEKTUR ENTHALTENDES ANTIFALTENMITTEL FÜR TEXTILIEN | [2005/31] | English: | ANTI-CREASING COMPOSITION COMPRISING A COPOLYMER HAVING A CONTROLLED ARCHITECTURE, FOR ITEMS CONSISTING OF TEXTILE FIBRES | [2005/31] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ANTIFROISSAGE COMPRENANT UN COPOLYMERE A ARCHITECTURE CONTRÔLEE, POUR ARTICLES EN FIBRES TEXTILES | [2009/20] |
Former [2005/31] | COMPOSITION D'ANTIFROISSAGE COMPRENANT UN COPOLYMERE A ARCHITECTURE CONTR LEE, POUR ARTICLES EN FIBRES TEXTILES | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Request for further processing for: | 11.06.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IE | 14.10.2009 | IT | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | LU | 27.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | HU | 15.04.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
TR | 14.10.2009 | ||
LU | 27.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
LU | 27.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
LU | 27.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9955952 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-32* page 10, line 6 - page 14, line 8; claims 1-3,6,10 *; | [A]EP1099749 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0050]; examples 1-3,7,9,12,14; claims 1-3 *; | [A]FR2813312 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR]) [A] 1-32 * page 2, line 3 - line 10 * * example 2; claim - *; | [A]EP1201816 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-32 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] * * examples 1,4; claims 4-11 *; | [A]DE10060373 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-32 * examples 1-4; claims 1,15,18 * |