EP1567667 - TREATMENT OF HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE WITH EPA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amarin Neuroscience Limited Kings Park House Laurelhill Business Park Polmaise Road Stirling FK7 9JQ / GB | [2008/42] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Amarin Neuroscience Limited Kings Park House Laurelhill Business Park Polmaise Road Stirling FK7 9JQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORROBIN, David Frederick deceased / GB | [2008/42] |
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
HORROBIN, David Frederick Laxdale Ltd, Kings Pk House, Polmaise Road Stirling FK7 9JQ / GB | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03778516.9 | 26.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003GB05131 | Priority number, date | GB20020028079 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0228079 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004050913 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567667 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567667 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61K31/00, A61P25/28 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | 31.05.2005 | LT | 31.05.2005 | LV | 31.05.2005 | MK | 31.05.2005 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG DER HUNTINGTON'S KRANKHEIT MIT EPA | [2005/35] | English: | TREATMENT OF HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE WITH EPA | [2005/35] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE DE HUNTINGTON AU MOYEN D'ACIDE EICOSAPENTAENOIQUE | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0614977 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-6* claim 13 *; | [Y]WO9915639 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-6 * pages 1-7; claims 5,10 *; | [A]WO0124781 (NOVANEURON INC [CA], et al); | [A]US6384077 (PEET MALCOLM [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 34 * * column 14, paragraph 3 - column 16, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2002077361 (PEET MALCOLM [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 8, paragraph 3 - column 9, paragraph 2 *; | [Y] - BECHER M W ET AL, "INTRANUCLEAR NEURONAL INCLUSIONS IN HUNTINGTON DISEASE AND DENTATORUBRAL AND PALLIDOLUYSIAN ATROPHY: CORRELATION BETWEEN THE DENSITY OF INCLUSIONS AND IT15 CAG TRIPLET REPEAT LENGTH", NEUROBIOLOGY OF DISEASE, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (199804), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 0969-9961, pages 387 - 397, XP000997534 [Y] 1-6 * page 392, paragraph 2 - page 395 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/nbdi.1998.0168 | [A] - NANCE M A, "CLINICAL ASPECTS OF CAG REPEAT DISEASES", BRAIN PATHOLOGY, ZUERICH, CH, (199707), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1015-6305, pages 881 - 900, XP000998301 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1148873 |