EP1579741 - IMPROVED HIGH FREQUENCY ELECTRONIC BALLAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Jerry, Martin P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | 02 /
JANCZAK, Jerzy P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | 03 /
VAN ESVELD, Hendrik, A. P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | 04 /
VAN DER VOORT, Ronald, H. P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03778631.6 | 12.12.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003IB05977 | Priority number, date | US20020324789 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 324789 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004057931 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579741 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/292 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H05B41/388 (EP,US);
H05B41/2928 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES HOCHFREQUENZVORSCHALTGERÄT | [2005/39] | English: | IMPROVED HIGH FREQUENCY ELECTRONIC BALLAST | [2005/39] | French: | BALLAST ELECTRONIQUE HAUTE FREQUENCE AMELIORE | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6225754 (HORIUCHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * column 14, lines 30-40; figure - * * high frequency driving signal amplitude modulated with a low frequency modulating signal * [Y] 3-7,10-13; | [Y]EP0785702 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]) [Y] 3,10 * figure - * * very high frequency driving signal *; | [Y]US5859505 (BERGMAN ANTHONIE H [NL], et al) [Y] 4-7,11-13 * figures 3,9 * * column 3, lines 20-25 * * column 8, lines 35-65 * * using standard deviation of lamp voltage for setting operational paramenters (determining operational frequency window) * |