EP1697723 - A MEASURING CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blue I Water Technologies Ltd. 20 Atir Yeda Street 44643 Kfar Saba / IL | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN DAVID, Tsur 2B Nachal Habsor Street Ramat Hasharon 47263 / IL | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
BEN DAVID, Tsur Vitkin 11 47263 Ramat Hasharon / IL | Representative(s) | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03778718.1 | 08.12.2003 | [2006/36] | WO2003IL01038 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005054824 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697723 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697723 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01N21/15, G01N1/28, G01N1/38 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
G01N21/15 (EP,US);
G01N2021/152 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSZELLE | [2006/36] | English: | A MEASURING CELL | [2006/36] | French: | CELLULE DE MESURE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 14.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2007 | BE | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | CZ | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | EE | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | RO | 06.06.2007 | SI | 06.06.2007 | SK | 06.06.2007 | BG | 06.09.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | HU | 07.12.2007 | LU | 08.12.2007 | IE | 10.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
LU | 08.12.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 06.06.2007 | |
SE | 06.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5185531 (WYNN WILLIAM H [US]) [A] 1,2,8,10 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 21 * * column 4, line 12 - line 27; figures 1-3,7,8 *; | [A]US5824270 (RAO TENNETI V [US]) [A] 1-3,8-10 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 61; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0002031 (LAMINA INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,10 * page 5, line 7 - line 21 * * page 21, line 23 - page 22, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002130069 (MOSKOFF HAROLD I [CA]) [A] 1,2,8-10* paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * |