EP1583464 - CLUSTERING OF RECORDED PATIENT NEUROLOGICAL ACTIVITY TO DETERMINE LENGTH OF A NEUROLOGICAL EVENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2014/15] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. LC 340, 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREI, Mark, G. 2513 Via Linda Drive Lawrence, KS 66047 / US | 02 /
OSORIO, Ivan 4005 W. 124th Street Leawood, KS 66209 / US | 03 /
GRAVES, Nina, M. 4312 Ridge Court Minnetonka, MN 55391 / US | 04 /
SCHAFFNER, Scott, F. 10602 Showboat Cove Austin, TX 78730 / US | 05 /
RISE, Mark, T. 7745 Aetna Avenue NE Monticello, MN 55362 / US | 06 /
GIFTAKIS, Jonathon, E. 6741 Troy Lane N. Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 07 /
CARLSON, David, L. 141 46th Avenue NE Fridley, MN 55421 / US | [2014/03] |
Former [2005/41] | 01 /
FREI, Mark, G. 2513 Via Linda Drive Lawrence, KS 66047 / US | ||
02 /
OSORIO, Ivan 4005 W. 124th Street Leawood, KS 66209 / US | |||
03 /
GRAVES, Nina, M. 4312 Ridge Court Minnetonka, MN 55391 / US | |||
04 /
SCHAFFNER, Scott, F. 10602 Showboat Cove Austin, TX 78730 / US | |||
05 /
RISE, Mark, T. 7745 Aetna Avenue NE Monticello, MN 55362 / US | |||
06 /
GIFTAKIS, Jonathon, E. 3701 78th Avenue N Brooklyn Park, MN 55443 / US | |||
07 /
CARLSON, David, L. 141 46th Avenue NE Fridley, MN 55421 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/15] |
Former [2005/41] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03779123.3 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/41] | WO2003US32940 | Priority number, date | US20020418496P | 15.10.2002 Original published format: US 418496 P | US20030503794P | 19.09.2003 Original published format: US 503794 P | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004034882 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583464 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583464 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/4094 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (EP);
A61B5/369 (EP,US);
A61B5/374 (US);
A61N1/36025 (EP,US);
A61N1/36082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | CLUSTERING EINER AUFGEZEICHNETENNEUROLOGISCHEN AKTIVITÄT EINES PATIENTEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER LÄNGE EINESNEUROLOGISCHEN EREIGNISSES | [2005/41] | English: | CLUSTERING OF RECORDED PATIENT NEUROLOGICAL ACTIVITY TO DETERMINE LENGTH OF A NEUROLOGICAL EVENT | [2005/41] | French: | MISE EN GRAPPE DE L'ACTIVITE NEUROLOGIQUE ENREGISTREE D'UN PATIENT DANS LA DETERMINATION DE LA LONGUEUR D'UN INCIDENT NEUROLOGIQUE | [2005/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2013 | 15.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2003 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | GB | 15.10.2014 | IE | 15.10.2014 | LU | 15.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/31] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BG | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - GOTMAN J ET AL, "Automatic seizure detection in the newborn: methods and initial evaluation.", ELECTROENCEPHALOGRAPHY AND CLINICAL NEUROPHYSIOLOGY SEP 1997, (199709), vol. 103, no. 3, ISSN 0013-4694, pages 356 - 362, XP002502776 [X] 27 * page 358, column 2, line 1 - line 7 * * page 359, column 1, line 2 - line 6 * * page 360, column 1, line 12 - line 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0013-4694(97)00003-9 | [X] - OSORIO I ET AL, "REAL-TIME AUTOMATED DETECTION AND QUANTITATIVE ANALYSIS OF SEIZURES AND SHORT-TERM PREDICTION OF CLINICAL ONSET", EPILEPSIA, RAVEN PRESS LTD., NEW YORK, (19980601), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 0013-9580, pages 615 - 627, XP008012666 [X] 27 * page 618, column 1, line 3 - page 619, column 1, line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1528-1157.1998.tb01430.x | [X] - PRINCIPE J ET AL, "Microcomputer-based system for the detection and quantification of petit mal epilepsy", COMPUTERS IN BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 0010-4825, (19820101), pages 87 - 95, (19820101), XP022875395 [X] 27 * page 88 - 89, section 'A petit mal seizure model' * * page 90, line 10 - line 13; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4825(82)90017-8 | [X] - WENG W ET AL, "An Adaptive Structure Neural Networks with Application to EEG Automatic Seizure Detection", NEURAL NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19961001), vol. 9, no. 7, ISSN 0893-6080, pages 1223 - 1240, XP004094297 [X] 27 * page 1233, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0893-6080(96)00032-9 | [X] - OSORIO IVAN ET AL, "Performance reassessment of a real-time seizure-detection algorithm on long ECoG series.", EPILEPSIA DEC 2002., Presented in part at AES Annual Meeting, Philadelphia 2001, (200212), vol. 43, no. 12, ISSN 0013-9580, pages 1522 - 1535, XP002502785 [X] 27 * page 1524, column 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 1526, section "Detection clustering'' * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1528-1157.2002.11102.x | International search | [A]US5857978 (HIVELY LEE M [US], et al); | [A]US5995868 (OSORIO IVAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US4692147 | US5995868 | US6227203 | US6341236 |