EP1574553 - INK-JET INK AND RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Atsushi, Konica Minolta M & G, Inc. 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 03780820.1 | 17.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003JP16151 | Priority number, date | JP20020366441 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002366441 | [2005/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055122 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574553 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574553 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41M5/00, B41J2/01 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2006/15] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKTINTE UND -VERFAHREN | [2005/37] | English: | INK-JET INK AND RECORDING METHOD | [2005/37] | French: | ENCRE POUR JET D'ENCRE ET PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2005 | Translation filed | 15.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000318296 ; | [X]EP0799871 (SERICOL LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1188806 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1* claim 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 23, Database accession no. 2001-220464, XP002379124 & JP2000318296 A 20001121 (OSAKA INSATSU INK SEIZO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0517712 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]GB2303376 (FUJITSU ISOTEC LTD [JP]); | [Y]JPH09165541 (KAO CORP); | [X] - NOGUCHI H., "UV inkjet gijutsu no tenbo", SHIKIZAI KYOKAISHI, (20020820), vol. 75, no. 8, pages 394 - 400, XP002986745 |