EP1577489 - ROTARY FLUID MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKINO, Hiroyuki, KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
HONMA, Kensuke, KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
KAMOI, Yasuharu, KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Prechtel, Jörg Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03780999.3 | 22.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003JP16481 | Priority number, date | JP20020374329 | 25.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002374329 | JP20030379929 | 10.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003379929 | [2005/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004059130 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577489 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01B3/02, F01B31/06 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
F04B1/2071 (EP,US);
F04B27/0856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/16] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTATIONSFLUIDMASCHINE | [2005/38] | English: | ROTARY FLUID MACHINE | [2005/38] | French: | MACHINE A FLUIDE ROTATIVE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2005 | Translation filed | 16.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 01.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02070865 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH0464962U ; | [Y]JP2000262004 (NEC CORP) |