EP1573379 - STEREOMICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Instruments (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. 12 Teban Gardens Crescent 608924 Singapore / SG | [2010/14] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Leica Instruments Pte. Ltd. 12 Teban Gardens Crescent 608924 Singapur / SG | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Leica Microsystems (Schweiz) AG Max Schmidheiny-Strasse 201 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDER, Ulrich Höhlerstr. 53 CH- 9445 Revstein / CH | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems AG, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 03782245.9 | 28.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP13403 | Priority number, date | DE2002155965 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10255965 | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004051342 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573379 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/22 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G02B21/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | STEREOMIKROSKOP | [2005/37] | English: | STEREOMICROSCOPE | [2005/37] | French: | STEREOMICROSCOPE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5822114 (HANZAWA TOYOHARU [JP]); | [DX]EP1120676 (MITAKA KOKI KK [JP]) |