EP1576632 - OPTICAL OPERATION INDICATOR FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, IN ADDITION TO DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, IN PARTICULAR A BUILT-IN DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLASSEN, Egbert Peter-Dörfler-Weg 3 86637 Wertingen / DE | 02 /
HERING, Reinhard St.-Stephanus-Str. 8 89438 Holzheim / DE | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
CLASSEN, Egbert Max-Reger-Str. 2 86637 Wertingen / DE | ||
02 /
HERING, Reinhard St.-Stephanus-Str. 8 89438 Holzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03782307.7 | 04.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003EP13719 | Priority number, date | DE20021059763 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10259763 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004057636 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1576632 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1576632 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1576632 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/16, A47L15/42 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
A47L15/4293 (EP,US);
H01H9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE BETRIEBSANZEIGE FÜR EIN HAUSHALTGERÄT SOWIE HAUSHALTGERÄT, INSBESONDERE EINBAU-HAUSHALTGERÄT | [2005/38] | English: | OPTICAL OPERATION INDICATOR FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, IN ADDITION TO DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, IN PARTICULAR A BUILT-IN DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [2005/38] | French: | INDICATEUR OPTIQUE DE FONCTIONNEMENT CON U POUR UN APPAREIL MENAGER, ET APPAREIL MENAGER, EN PARTICULIER APPAREIL MENAGER A ENCASTRER | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2015 | Observations by third parties | 14.04.2016 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.2009
17.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Whirlpool Europe Srl Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT Opponent's representative Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | 02
28.08.2009
08.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Fürther Strasse 246 90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.2009
17.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Whirlpool Europe Srl Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT Opponent's representative Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | ||
02
28.08.2009
08.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Fürther Strasse 246 90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Bolte & Partner, et al, et al Anwaltssozietät GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | |||
Former [2009/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Whirlpool Europe Srl Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT Opponent's representative Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | ||
02
28.08.2009
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Fürther Strasse 246 90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | 13.10.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.04.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.01.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.07.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 30.08.2011 | Appeal received No. T1955/11 | 10.11.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | LU | 04.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | AT | 04.12.2009 | SE | 05.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/31] |
Former [2010/49] | CY | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 04.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
AT | 04.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CY | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 04.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
AT | 04.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 04.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 04.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0691100 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 43 - column 6, line 55 *; | [A]EP0742308 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP1151717 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP1207353 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 12 * [A] 3,6-10 | other | US2875668 | US3136210 | US3619592 | EP0691100 | DE19959149 | DE20103517U | EP1151717 | EP1207353 | EP1421893 | DE10255006 | Opposition | EP1421893 | DE10255006 |