EP1575535 - CARE AND/OR MAKE-UP COSMETIC COMPOSITION STRUCTURED WITH SILICONE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOURNILHAC, Florence 55, rue de Charonne F-75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
BLIN, Xavier 24, rue de Stael F-75015 Paris / FR | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Chantraine, Sylvie Hélène L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Chantraine, Sylvie Hélène L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29, Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnieres / FR | ||
Former [2005/38] | Chantraine, Sylvie Hélène L'ORÉAL, River Plaza, 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnieres-sur-Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 03782490.1 | 08.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003EP15006 | Priority number, date | FR20020016040 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0216040 | US20030438782P | 09.01.2003 Original published format: US 438782 P | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054523 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575535 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575535 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/898, A61K8/34, A61Q1/00 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61Q1/00 (EP,US);
A61Q1/04 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | A61K7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR KOSMETIK ODER ZUM SCHMINKEN STRUKTURIERT MIT SILIKONPOLYMEREN | [2005/38] | English: | CARE AND/OR MAKE-UP COSMETIC COMPOSITION STRUCTURED WITH SILICONE POLYMERS | [2005/38] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE DE SOIN ET/OU DE MAQUILLAGE STRUCTUREE AU MOYEN DE POLYMERES DE SILICONE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 10.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | BE | 17.12.2008 | CY | 17.12.2008 | CZ | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | RO | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | SK | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | BG | 17.03.2009 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | HU | 18.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0594285 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [A]US5874069 (MENDOLIA MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [A]US5969172 (NYE SUSAN A [US]) [A] 1-56* the whole document *; | [A]US6051216 (BARR MORTON L [US], et al) [A] 1-56 * examples C-G *; | [A]US2002048557 (CAI HENG [US], et al) [A] 1-56 * examples 1-14 *; | [A]US2002051758 (CAI HENG [US], et al) [A] 1-56 * example 5; claims 1,27,28 * |