EP1565896 - SAFETY SYSTEM FOR PERSONS RUNNING THE RISK OF DROWNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borne, Sylvie 47, Allée Jules Verne 07500 Guilherand-Granges / FR | For all designated states Borne, Franck 47, Allée Jules Verne 07500 Guilherand-Granges / FR | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03782548.6 | 13.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003FR03355 | Priority number, date | FR20020014157 | 13.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0214157 | [2005/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004047040 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1565896 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565896 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/08, B63C9/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G08B21/088 (EP);
B63C9/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSYSTEM FÜR PERSONEN MIT DEM RISIKO IN WASSER ZU FALLEN | [2005/34] | English: | SAFETY SYSTEM FOR PERSONS RUNNING THE RISK OF DROWNING | [2005/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE POUR DES PERSONNES SUSCEPTIBLES D'ETRE IMMERGEES | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2008 | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IE | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | RO | 12.11.2008 | SI | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | BG | 12.02.2009 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | HU | 13.05.2009 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CY | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 12.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4549169 (MOURA MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0653737 (CASEY BRIAN WILLIAM [ZA]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]US5627520 (GRUBBS CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]US5650770 (SCHLAGER DAN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 7, line 18 - line 39 *; | [A]US5900817 (OLMASSAKIAN VAHE [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US5912623 (PIERSON MARTIN D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0007155 (PITZER BERYL E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-10 *; | [AD]US6157303 (BODIE JOHN [CA], et al) [AD] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US6317050 (BURKS NATHANIEL W [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |