EP1578704 - FIBRE MATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saffil Limited 381, Fulwood Road Sheffield, South Yorkshire S10 3GB / GB | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINWOODIE, John 9 Pineridge Close, Spital Wirral L62 2EE / GB | 02 /
NEWTON, Angus, William 24 Aughton Road, Birkdale Southport PR8 2AG / GB | 03 /
WADE, Katherine 19 Riverside Park, Northwhich Cheshire CW8 1DS / GB | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Dowler, Edward Charles HLBBshaw Merlin House Falcony Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/39] | Dowler, Edward Charles HLBBshaw 10th Floor, 1 Hagley Road GB-Edgbaston, Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 03782633.6 | 17.12.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003GB05505 | Priority number, date | GB20020029380 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0229380 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054942 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578704 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1578704 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C04B30/02, C04B26/04, F01N3/28, F01N3/021, C04B20/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
C04B30/02 (EP,US);
B32B3/00 (KR);
C04B14/46 (KR);
C04B20/0052 (EP,US);
C04B24/26 (KR);
C04B26/04 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
F01N3/2853 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B30/02, C04B14/4625, C04B14/4631, C04B14/4656, C04B24/2641, C04B40/0028 (EP,US);
C04B30/02, C04B20/0052, C04B24/2641, C04B40/0028 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2005/39] | C04B30/02, C04B26/04, F01N3/28, F01N3/021, C04B20/00, // (C04B30/02, 14:46, 14:46), C04B24:26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERMATTE | [2005/39] | English: | FIBRE MATS | [2005/39] | French: | NAPPES DE FIBRES | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2008 | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | IE | 17.12.2008 | LU | 17.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CY | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
TR | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
LU | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CY | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
LU | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
LU | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BG | 15.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0009940 (ISOLITE BABCOCK REFRACTORIES [JP]) [X] 1,16,18 * page 2, lines 1-15 * * page 11, lines 10-31 *; | [A]EP0398130 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [A] 1,13* page 4, line 48 - page 5, line 14 *; | [XA]EP0522722 (CARBORUNDUM CO [US]) [X] 1,2,16 * claim - * [A] 3,6,14,19; | [X]US5290350 (BESNARD MARIE-MADELEINE [FR], et al) [X] 1,16,18 * column 2, lines 5-21 * * column 3, lines 25-33 *; | [XA]GB2319247 (MANN IAN JAMES [GB]) [X] 1,16 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph L * * page 14, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph 2 * [A] 14 |