EP1577955 - OPTICAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | [2013/50] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yasuhiro, @Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNO, Seiichiro, @Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2013/50] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yasuhiro, Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
MIZUNO, Seiichiro, Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/50] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03782900.9 | 25.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003JP16801 | Priority number, date | JP20020375130 | 25.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002375130 | [2005/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004059748 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577955 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577955 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/46, H01L27/146, H04N3/14, H04N5/355, H04N5/378 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
G01J1/46 (EP,US);
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L27/14661 (EP,US);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N25/77 (EP);
H04N25/772 (US);
H04N25/78 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | H01L31/10, G01J1/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/16] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHER SENSOR | [2005/38] | English: | OPTICAL SENSOR | [2005/38] | French: | CAPTEUR OPTIQUE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | Translation filed | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0845687 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [X]US5900623 (TSANG RANDY P L [US], et al); | [A]JP2001291877 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) | International search | [A]JPS63240065 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [A]JPH03195278 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH04172083 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH0868691 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2000101060 (FUJI FILM MICRODEVICES CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | EP0845687 | US5900623 |