04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
21.12.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
12.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
15.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
02.03.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
03.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
27.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
09.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
02.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
25.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
11.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
04.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
25.03.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
29.11.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.09.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.05.2007 |
First examination report |
|
15.05.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] |
22.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
24.06.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
09.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|