EP1535153 - PRIORITIZATION METHOD OF INFORMATION TRANSMITTERS, PARTICULARLY FOR EXECUTING THE COORDINATED DRIVE TRAIN CONTROL OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSIERE, Dirk Karlsstrasse 42 71679 Asperg / DE | 02 /
BICKENDORF, Frank Wolf-Hirth-Str. 1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 03 /
FREI, Rasmus Farbstrasse 9/1 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2005/22] | Application number, filing date | 03783934.7 | 29.07.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003DE02540 | Priority number, date | DE2002134636 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234636 | DE2003134535 | 29.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10334535 | [2005/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004014699 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1535153 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535153 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
G06F9/4806 (EP,US);
B60W50/06 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0001 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, SE [2005/41] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PRIORISIERUNGSVERFAHREN VON INFORMATIONSGEBERN, INSBESONDERE ZUR KOORDINIERTEN ANTRIEBSSTRANGSTEUERUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2005/22] | English: | PRIORITIZATION METHOD OF INFORMATION TRANSMITTERS, PARTICULARLY FOR EXECUTING THE COORDINATED DRIVE TRAIN CONTROL OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRIORISATION DE TRANSMETTEURS D'INFORMATIONS, NOTAMMENT POUR LA COMMANDE COORDONNEE DE LA CHAINE CINEMATIQUE D'UN VEHICULE | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | FR | 04.08.2014 | [2015/25] |
Former [2015/22] | ES | 04.06.2014 | |
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 04.06.2014 | |
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | SE | 04.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4954948 (HIRA GERALD M [US], et al) [A] 11 * abstract * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 55 *; | [A]FR2714642 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 3,4 * abstract * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 35 *; | [X]US5938708 (WALLACE JON KELLY [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0157650 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 5-10 * abstract * * page 6, line 15 - line 20 ** page 12, line 10 - line 23 *; | [AD]DE10044319 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 12-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19838333 | EP0883510 | DE10044319 |