EP1530612 - FLAME-RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE MOULDED MASSES MODIFIED WITH A GRAFT POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKEL, Thomas Pfauenstr. 51 41540 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
SEIDEL, Andreas Birnenweg 5 41542 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
GONZALEZ-BLANCO, Juan Kerpener Str. 1a 50937 Köln / DE | 04 /
WITTMANN, Dieter Ernst-Ludwig-Kirchner-Str. 41 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2005/20] | Application number, filing date | 03784046.9 | 23.07.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003EP08034 | Priority number, date | DE2002135754 | 05.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10235754 | [2005/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004015001 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530612 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530612 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/521, C08L69/00 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/521 (EP,KR,US);
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F279/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/523 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/005 (EP,US);
C08K5/0066 (EP,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L27/12 (EP,US);
C08L33/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/521, C08L69/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/523, C08L69/00 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/14 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMWIDRIGE MIT PFROPFPOLYMERISAT MODIFIZIERTE POLYCARBONAT-FORMMASSEN | [2005/20] | English: | FLAME-RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE MOULDED MASSES MODIFIED WITH A GRAFT POLYMER | [2005/20] | French: | MATIERES A MOULER POLYCARBONATE IGNIFUGES ET MODIFIEES AVEC UN POLYMERE GREFFE | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2009 | CZ | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | IE | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | TR | 07.01.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | SE | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | AT | 23.07.2009 | LU | 23.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
AT | 23.07.2009 | ||
LU | 23.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
AT | 23.07.2009 | ||
LU | 23.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
AT | 23.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | FI | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | SI | 07.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0771851 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1-18* claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO9907782 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * claims 1,6,12-14 *; | [Y]DE19914137 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * claims 1-4,6,10,11,13,14,18 *; | [Y]US6180702 (CHUNG JAMES Y J [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * claims 1,3-6,9 *; | [A]EP1201714 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [A] 1-18 * claims 1,3,10 *; | [A]US2002091180 (LIM JONG-CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim 1 * |