10.08.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
26.04.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
17.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
09.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
29.04.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
22.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|