Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003247126 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2004 | A8 | AU2003247126 | 25.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21193702 | 02.08.2002 | IB0303333 | 21.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1535129 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2006 | A4 | EP1535129 | 01.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21193702 | 02.08.2002 | IB0303333 | 21.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004015514 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2004 | A3 | WO2004015514 | 19.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21193702 | 02.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004024662 | 05.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21193702 | 02.08.2002 |