EP1537656 - IMPROVED ELECTROMAGNETIC INTERFERENCE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dearborn Electronics Inc 1221 North Highway 17-92 Longwood, FL 32750 / US | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Mark, A. 404 Bridle Path Casselberry, FL 32707-3142 / US | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Loven, Keith James Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03785077.3 | 07.08.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003US24919 | Priority number, date | US20020401855P | 07.08.2002 Original published format: US 401855 P | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004015838 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1537656 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/01, H01G4/35 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
H01G4/35 (EP,US);
H01G4/40 (EP,US);
H03H2001/0014 (EP,US);
H03H2001/0042 (EP,US);
H03H2001/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES FILTER FÜR ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE STÖRUNGEN | [2005/23] | English: | IMPROVED ELECTROMAGNETIC INTERFERENCE FILTER | [2005/23] | French: | FILTRE D'INTERFERENCE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE AMELIORE | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4424551 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 9,10,17 * column 7, lines 27,28 *; | [A]US5333095 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002027484 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * figures 5-9 *; | [Y] - H. SCHAUMBURG, Einführung in die Werkstoffe der Elektrotechnik, STUTTGART, B. G. TEUBNER, (1993), XP002462046 [Y] 1-20 * pages 156-162 * | [A] - MCCLUSKEY P ET AL, "Reliability concerns in high temperature electronic systems", HIGH-TEMPERATURE ELECTRONIC MATERIALS, DEVICES AND SENSORS CONFERENCE, 1998 SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 22-27 FEB. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980222), ISBN 0-7803-4437-5, pages 199 - 206, XP010313533 [A] 1-20 * page 201, column 2, paragraphs 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HTEMDS.1998.730698 | [A] - Ceramic dielectric capacitors classes I, II, III & IV, EIA, (1998), XP002462047 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US3249834 (SCHLICKE HEINZ M, et al); | [A]US3546638 (PARK WILLIAM O); | [A]US3548347 (MILLER DAVID S, et al); | [A]US3753168 (SCHOR F); | [A]US4148003 (COLBURN RICHARD H, et al); | [A]US4424551 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]US5333095 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al); | [AP]US6456481 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US]) |