EP1583338 - THE METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE USER CALLING LOAD IN SOFT SWITCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District 518057 Shenzhen City Guangdong Province / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District 518057 Shenzhen City Guandong Province / CN | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District 518057 Shenzhen City Guandong Province / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TU, Jiashun, ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Ind. Park, Nanshan Distr Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
MU, Lingjiang, ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Ind. Park, Nanshan Distr Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LI, Ming, ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Ind. Park, Nanshan Distr Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Schröer, Gernot H., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03785459.3 | 23.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003CN01108 | Priority number, date | CNX3114845 | 08.01.2003 Original published format: CN 3114845.X | [2005/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004064364 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583338 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583338 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/36 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04M3/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER BENUTZERANRUFLAST IN SOFTSWITCH-SYSTEMEN | [2005/40] | English: | THE METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE USER CALLING LOAD IN SOFT SWITCH SYSTEM | [2005/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DU VOLUME DES COMMUNICATIONS D'UN USAGER DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUTATION SOUPLE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2005 | Translation filed | 20.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | IE | 23.12.2008 | LU | 23.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CY | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
TR | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CY | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BG | 29.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5881137 (GINZBOORG PHILIP [FI], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, lines 25-44 * * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 62 * [A] 5-14; | [A] - HOUCK D MEEMPAT G, "Call admission control and load balacing for voice over IP", PERFORMANCE EVALUATION, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2002), no. 47, ISSN 0166-5316, pages 243 - 253, XP002360605 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-5316(01)00066-9 | International search | [Y]US5835490 (PARK WOO-GOO [KR], et al); | [Y]CN1275851 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US6259776 (HUNT ROWLAND GEOFFREY [GB]) |