EP1573763 - DEVICE FOR ACTUATING ELECTRIC FUNCTIONAL GROUPS, IN PARTICULAR HORNS ON THE STEERING WHEELS OF MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takata-Petri AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖLZEL, Thomas Spessartstrasse 6 64850 Schaafheim / DE | 02 /
HEEG, Markus Am Geisberg 36 63773 Goldbach / DE | 03 /
SAUER, Frank Ringstrasse 13 63843 Niedernberg / DE | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03785549.1 | 02.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003DE03998 | Priority number, date | DE2002219729U | 18.12.2002 Original published format: DE 20219729 U | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055845 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573763 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573763 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/18, B60Q5/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H01H1/18 (EP,US);
B60Q5/001 (EP,US);
B60Q5/003 (EP);
B60R16/0215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2005/51] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BETÄTIGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN FUNKTIONSGRUPPEN, INSBESONDERE VON HUPEN AN LENKRÄDERN VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [2005/37] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACTUATING ELECTRIC FUNCTIONAL GROUPS, IN PARTICULAR HORNS ON THE STEERING WHEELS OF MOTOR VEHICLES | [2005/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ACTIONNER DES GROUPES DE FONCTION ELECTRIQUES, NOTAMMENT UN KLAXON MONTE SUR LE VOLANT D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 23.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]CH204988 (BUSCH JOHANN [CH]) [X] 1,4,8,11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,17-24; | [Y]US2671840 (SWAY HENRY C) [Y] 12,13,17 * column 1, line 1 - line 16 * * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 59 * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]DE758108 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 18-23 * page 2, line 74 - page 3, line 56 * * page 4, line 65 - line 92 * * figures 1-3,10,11 *; | [Y]DE19852243 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 24 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]JPH03284470 ; | [XA]EP1099604 (GALLINO PLASTURGIA S R L [IT]) [X] 2,4,5,7-11,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] * * figures 1-3,5,8 * [A] 1,14,15; | [XA]EP0390029 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [X] 2,4,8,16 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 32 * * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 42 * * figures 2,5-7 * [A] 5,6,9; | [X]JPH0454791 ; | [X]JP2002166813 ; | [X]US5459294 (DANIELSON DAVID J [US]) [X] 2 * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 1, line 40 - line 55 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 50 * * figures 1-6 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920323), vol. 0161, no. 15, Database accession no. (M - 1224), & JP3284470 A 19911216 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1,8,11 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 9 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP9254791 A 19970930 (TOYODA GOSEI CO LTD) [X] 2-4 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002166813 A 20020611 (T S TEC KK) [X] 2 * abstract * * figures 3-6 * |