EP1628892 - PARTIALLY OVAL SPRAY CAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim microParts GmbH Hauert 7 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christ, Alexander Siegburger Strasse 195 50679 Köln / DE | 02 /
Endert, Guido Rothenberg 96 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
Wergen, Horst Helmholtzstrasse 25 42105 Wuppertal / DE | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/01] |
Former [2006/09] | Vogel, Andreas Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel, Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 03785911.3 | 22.12.2003 | [2006/09] | WO2003EP14717 | Priority number, date | DE20021061534 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10261534 | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004058597 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1628892 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1628892 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14, B21D51/26 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B65D83/38 (EP,US);
B21D51/2615 (EP,US);
B21D51/2646 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILWEISE OVALE SPRAYDOSE | [2006/09] | English: | PARTIALLY OVAL SPRAY CAN | [2006/09] | French: | BOMBE AEROSOL PARTIELLEMENT OVALE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.11.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | 10.11.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.11.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | IE | 19.08.2009 | NL | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | AT | 22.12.2009 | LU | 22.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | HU | 20.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
AT | 22.12.2009 | ||
LU | 22.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 22.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 19.08.2009 | |
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 19.08.2009 | |
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 19.08.2009 | |
SE | 19.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS61193730 ; | [YA]DE2426240 (KITSUDA KANAME) [Y] 14 * the whole document * [A] 10-13,15; | [XY]FR2606686 (CEBAL [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,10-13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 14; | [A]US5572893 (GODA MARK E [US], et al) [A] 11-15* the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870121), vol. 011, no. 021, Database accession no. (M - 555), & JP61193730 A 19860828 (TAKEUCHI PRESS KOGYO KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 6-11,13 | by applicant | DE2426240 | JPS61193730 | US5572893 |