EP1733579 - ADAPTIVE POWER MANAGEMENT FOR A NODE OF A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGEMAN, Halbe, Tiemen Abdisstraat 83 NL-4841 HG Prinsenbeek / NL | 02 /
TERPSTRA, Hendrik, Friso Tvaspannvägen 39 NL-17758 Järfälla / SE | 03 /
FEENSTRA, Freddy Drilscholtenstraat 11 NL-7556 LK Hengelo / NL | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Seitz, Holger Fritz Karl Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Seitz, Holger Fritz Karl Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 03786419.6 | 19.12.2003 | [2006/51] | WO2003NL00912 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005060287 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733579 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733579 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04B1/16 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
H04W52/0261 (EP,US);
H02J1/10 (EP,US);
H02J2310/60 (EP);
H02J2310/64 (EP);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG FÜR EINEN KNOTEN EINES TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKS | [2006/51] | English: | ADAPTIVE POWER MANAGEMENT FOR A NODE OF A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2006/51] | French: | GESTION ADAPTATIVE DE LA CONSOMMATION D'UN NOEUD DE RESEAU MOBILE DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 28.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | BE | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | IT | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | PT | 27.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | GB | 19.12.2008 | IE | 19.12.2008 | LU | 19.12.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
GB | 19.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
GB | 19.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
GB | 19.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
GB | 19.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0287305 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, lines 44-51 * * column 2, lines 19-51 * * column 3, lines 18-53 * [A] 4-8; | [XA]GB2281458 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * the whole document * [A] 4,6,7; | [XA]US5410740 (HAGSTROEM ULF E [SE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 32 - column 7, line 53 *[A] 4-8; | [XA]WO0182641 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * figure 3 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 5 * * page 5, line 30 - page 8, line 3 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 8 * [A] 4,8; | [XA]US6584330 (RUUSKA TAUNO [SE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 4,12 * * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 53 * * column 10, lines 34-60 * [A] 5-8 |