EP1700356 - TUNABLE MICROWAVE ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEVORGIAN, Spartak Adler Salvius gata 15 S-411 11 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
LEWIN, Thomas Landstormsvägen 40 S-439 94 Onsala / SE | 03 /
KUYLENSTIERNA, Dan Södra Vägen 81 S-412 54 Göteborg / SE | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
GEVORGIAN, Spartak Adler Salvius gata 15 S-411 11 Göteborg / SE | ||
02 /
LEWIN, Thomas Landstormsvägen 40 S-439 94 Onsala / SE | |||
03 /
KUYLENSTIERNA, Dan Lindströmsgatan 3C S-412 61 Göteborg / SE | Representative(s) | Bergentall, Annika Maria Cegumark AB P.O. Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Bergentall, Annika Maria Cegumark AB, P.O. Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03786484.0 | 30.12.2003 | [2006/37] | WO2003SE02091 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005064737 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700356 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1700356 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/203, H01P5/18, H01P7/08 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
H01P1/20372 (EP,US);
H01P3/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01P1/181 (EP,US);
H01P1/2005 (EP,US);
H01P3/18 (KR);
H01P5/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTIMMBARE MIKROWELLENANORDNUNGEN | [2006/37] | English: | TUNABLE MICROWAVE ARRANGEMENTS | [2006/37] | French: | DISPOSITIFS A MICRO-ONDES ACCORDABLES | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/37] | DISPOSITIFS A MICRO-ONDES ACCORDABLE | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 29.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | BE | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | CZ | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | EE | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | IT | 03.06.2009 | RO | 03.06.2009 | SI | 03.06.2009 | SK | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | BG | 03.09.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | ES | 14.09.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | HU | 04.12.2009 | IE | 30.12.2009 | LU | 30.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
LU | 30.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
LU | 30.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0184663 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al); | [A]WO02089250 (PLASMA ANTENNAS LTD [GB], et al); | [A] - KUYLENSTIERNA D. ET AL., "Tunable electromagnetic bandgap structures based on ferroelectric films", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY, INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, DIGEST, (20030622), vol. 4, pages 879 - 882, XP010651282 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APS.2003.1220412 | [A] - KUYLENSTIERNA D. ET AL., "Tuneable electromagnetic bandgap structures based on Ba0.25Sr0.75TiO3 parallel-plate varactors on silicon coplanar waveguides", PROC., (20031007), vol. 3, pages 1111 - 1114, XP010681256 | [A] - KUYLENSTIERNA D. ET AL., "Tunable electromagnetic bandgap performance of coplanar waveguides periodically loaded by ferroelectric varactors", MICROWAVE AND OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20031020), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 81 - 86, XP002980943 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mop.11134 |