Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005064737 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7573358 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2009 | B2 | US2007262830 | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101036051B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2011 | B1 | KR20070012332 | 25.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003295303 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1700356 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2009 | B1 | EP1700356 | 13.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE433206T | 15.06.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2550776 | 05.07.2011 | C | CA2550776 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100592570C | 24.02.2010 | C | CN1886862 | 27.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60327905D1 | 16.07.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE0302091 | 30.12.2003 |