EP1570547 - HIGH CYCLE CONNECTOR CONTACT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville New York 11742-1300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WULFF, Thomas 25 Cheryl Lane North Patchogue, NY 11772 / US | 02 /
BELLOWS, David E. 2541 Mermaid avenue Wantagh, NY 11793 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
WULFF, Thomas 25 Cheryl Lane North Patchogue, NY 11772 / US | ||
02 /
BELLOWS, David E. 865 Broadway, Apt. 93B Holbrook, NY 11741 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03786629.0 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003US35766 | Priority number, date | US20020317452 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: US 317452 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055945 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570547 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
H01R13/2471 (EP,US);
H01R13/03 (EP,US);
H01R13/2421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHZYKLUS-VERBINDERKONTAKTSYSTEM | [2005/36] | English: | HIGH CYCLE CONNECTOR CONTACT SYSTEM | [2005/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTACTS DE CONNECTEUR A CYCLE ELEVE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2009 | 30.11.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5749754 (PATTERSON GREGORY S [US], et al); | [XP]US2004002243 (MELLOTT MARK BRADFORD [US], et al); | [X]US2001046801 (TATE JOE [US], et al); | [X]US6261130 (HUYNH KY [US], et al); | [Y]US6039580 (SCIARRETTA WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [Y]US5542015 (HULTERMANS ANTONIUS P C M [NL]); | [YE]US2003220022 (KAWAGUCHI DEAN [US], et al); | [AE]US6653562 (KOCHANSKI WALTER T [US], et al); | [A]US6280258 (FROHLUND STIG [SE]); | [A]US6450828 (GORDON SETH A [US]) | Examination | US5641315 | US5749754 | US5857866 | US6079999 | WO0074175 | US6261130 | US2001046801 |