EP1562445 - METHOD FOR REDUCING ACRYLAMIDE IN FOODS, AND FOODS HAVING REDUCED LEVELS OF ACRYLAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, HU, IE, LI, LU, RO, SK, TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pringles S.à.r.l. 560 A Rue de Neudorf 2220 Luxembourg / LU | [2014/25] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZYZAK, David, Vincent 7775 Hunters Trail Mason, OH 45040 / US | 02 /
LIN, Peter, Yau Tak 6753 Netherland Drive Liberty Township, OH 45044 / US | 03 /
SANDERS, Robert, Alan 915 Maple Ridge Court Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 04 /
STOJANOVIC, Marko 9518 Croton Drive Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 05 /
GRUBER, David, Cammiade 6241 Rogers Park Place Cincinnati, OH 45213 / US | 06 /
VILLAGRAN, Maria, Dolores, Martinez-Serna 5300 Sunset Ridge Mason, OH 45040 / US | 07 /
HOWIE, John, Keeney 5958 Olive Branch Road Oregonia, OH 45054 / US | 08 /
SCHAFERMEYER, Richard, Gerald 691 Buff Court Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2012/30] |
Former [2012/16] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Kellenberger, Jakob, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Kellenberger, Jakob, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2005/33] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al SA Procter & Gamble Services Company NV, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 03786938.5 | 20.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003US37216 | Priority number, date | US20020428365P | 22.11.2002 Original published format: US 428365 P | US20030606260 | 25.06.2003 Original published format: US 606260 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004047560 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562445 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562445 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/015, A23L1/217 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
C12Y305/01001 (EP,US);
A23L5/23 (EP,US);
A23L19/13 (EP,US);
A23L19/15 (EP,US);
A23L19/18 (EP,US);
A23L19/19 (EP,US);
A23L5/25 (EP,US);
A23L5/273 (EP,US);
A23L7/13 (EP,US);
C12Y305/01002 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SENKUNG DES ACRYLAMIDGEHALTS VON LEBENSMITTELN, LEBENSMITTEL MIT NIEDRIGEM ACRYLAMIDGEHALT | [2005/33] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING ACRYLAMIDE IN FOODS, AND FOODS HAVING REDUCED LEVELS OF ACRYLAMIDE | [2005/33] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A DIMINUER LE NIVEAU D'ACRYLAMIDE DANS DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES ET PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES PRESENTANT DES NIVEAUX LIMITES D'ACRYLAMIDE | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2011
13.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE PepsiCo Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, New York, USA / US Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2011
13.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE PepsiCo Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, New York, USA / US Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street GB-London WC1N 2BF / GB | 19.08.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.02.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/01] | 14.08.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2010 | BE | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | IE | 20.11.2010 | LU | 20.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | HU | 07.04.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/10] | SI | 06.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB807689 (INT MINERALS & CHEM CORP) [Y] 1-3 * example .; claim - *; | [E]WO2004026043 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-4* the whole document *; | [Y] - TAREKE E ET AL, "analysis of acrylamide, a carcinogen formed in heated foddstuffs", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (20020717), vol. 50, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 4998 - 5006, XP002237517 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf020302f | [Y] - "Brief Communications, ACRYLAMIDE IS FORMED IN THE MAILLARD REACTION", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (20021003), vol. 419, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 448 - 449, XP002235161 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/419448a | [Y] - BIEKMAN E S A, "TOEPASSING VAN ENZYMEN BIJ DE VERWERKING VAN AARDAPPELEN TOT CONSUMPTIEPRODUKTEN", VOEDINGSMIDDELEN TECHNOLOGIE, NOORDERVLIET B.V. ZEIST, NL, (19891012), vol. 22, no. 20, ISSN 0042-7934, pages 51 - 53, XP000069625 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * |