EP1573119 - PROCESS FOR APPLYING A POLYURETHANE DISPERSION BASED FOAM TO AN ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIBBLE, Michael, Y. Schwalbendonestrasse 49 CH-8832 Wolleerau / CH | 02 /
KENNEDY, James, G. The Old Bakehuse, 110 Hall Street, Briston Norfolk NR24 2LQ / GB | 03 /
WHITE, Douglas, P. 104 Sandlewood Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 04 /
VAN BELLEGEM, Paulus, C., J., M. Spuikompark 14 NL-4553 BC Phillippine / NL | 05 /
AUTENRIETH, Randal, E. 53 Raintree Court Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | [2007/06] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
GRIBBLE, Michael, Y. Schwalbendonestrasse 49 CH-8832 Wolleerau / CH | ||
02 /
KENNEDY, James, G. Moersluisstraat 12 NL-4561 HE Hulst / NL | |||
03 /
WHITE, Douglas, P. 104 Sandlewood Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
04 /
VAN BELLEGEM, Paulus, C., J., M. Spuikompark 14 NL-4553 BC Phillippine / NL | |||
05 /
AUTENRIETH, Randal, E. 53 Raintree Court Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | Representative(s) | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03786961.7 | 20.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US37273 | Priority number, date | US20020314854 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: US 314854 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004053223 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573119 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/14, B29C44/32, B32B31/00, B32B27/40, B32B5/18, C08J9/30 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C44/569 (EP,US);
B32B5/245 (US);
D06N3/0043 (EP,US);
D06N3/14 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0084 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0276 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2305/022 (EP,US);
B32B2305/18 (EP,US);
B32B2307/3065 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES AUF EINER POLYURETHANDISPERSION BASIERENDEN SCHAUMSTOFFS AUF EINEN GEGENSTAND | [2005/37] | English: | PROCESS FOR APPLYING A POLYURETHANE DISPERSION BASED FOAM TO AN ARTICLE | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'UNE MOUSSE A BASE D'UNE DISPERSION DE POLYURETHANE SUR UN ARTICLE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3849156 (MARLIN LAWRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1,2,20-22* abstract *; | [A]US3989869 (NEUMAIER HERMANN, et al) [A] 1-3,20-22 * abstract *; | [A]US4419457 (TOKUNAGA MOTOTSUGU [JP]) [A] 1-3,20-22 * column 1, line 30 - line 55 * * column 4, line 17 - line 37 * * example - * * claim - * * abstract *; | [A]WO9743326 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-3,20-22 * example - * * claim - * * abstract *; | [X]WO0039178 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,20-22 * page 7, line 23 - line 30 * * page 9, line 8 - line 30 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 8; example - * * claim - * * abstract * |