EP1525442 - METHOD FOR ANALYZING THE COLOR DEVIATIONS IN IMAGES USING AN IMAGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHWEG, Volker Linnenstrasse 35 33699 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
WILLEKE, Harald, Heinrich Robert-Koch-Strasse 12a 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2011/21] |
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
LOHWEG, Volker In der Linnenstrasse 35 33699 Bielefeld / DE | ||
02 /
WILLEKE, Harald, Heinrich Robert-Koch-Strasse 12a 33102 Paderborn / DE | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 03787613.3 | 27.06.2003 | WO2003DE02146 | Priority number, date | DE2002134085 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234085 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004017034 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525442 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525442 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/46 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G01J3/46 (EP,US);
G01J3/462 (EP,US);
G01J3/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON FARBABWEICHUNGEN VON BILDERN MIT EINEM BILDSENSOR | [2005/17] | English: | METHOD FOR ANALYZING THE COLOR DEVIATIONS IN IMAGES USING AN IMAGE SENSOR | [2005/17] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ANALYSER DES DIVERGENCES DE COULEUR DANS DES IMAGES A L'AIDE D'UN CAPTEUR D'IMAGE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2012
04.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2012
04.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2012/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2012
DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 13.04.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.05.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.07.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/37] | Appeal following opposition | 29.01.2014 | Appeal received No. T0252/14 | 29.01.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.07.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 11.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.06.2011 | CZ | 01.06.2011 | DK | 01.06.2011 | EE | 01.06.2011 | FI | 01.06.2011 | HU | 01.06.2011 | IE | 01.06.2011 | RO | 01.06.2011 | SE | 01.06.2011 | SI | 01.06.2011 | SK | 01.06.2011 | TR | 01.06.2011 | LU | 27.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 01.09.2011 | GR | 02.09.2011 | PT | 03.10.2011 | IT | 27.06.2013 | ES | 28.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | NL | 01.01.2014 | [2014/50] |
Former [2014/24] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HU | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
IT | 27.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HU | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HU | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/45] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HU | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4419395 (GRAPHIKON GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2002021444 (MACFARLANE DARBY S [US], et al) [A] 1-14* page 3, paragraph 45 - page 4, paragraph 60 * | Examination | US5361094 | EP0473432 | - SWAIN M J ET AL, "COLOR INDEXING", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NORWELL, US, (19911101), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1007/BF00130487, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 11 - 32, XP000248428 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00130487 | by applicant | DE4419395 | EP0473432 | DE69224812T | DE19838806 | US2002021444 | - MICHAEL J. SWAIN; DANA H. BALLARD, "Color Indexing", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (1991), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00130487, pages 11 - 32, XP008150018 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00130487 |