EP1525430 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SOUND VELOCITY IN A BASIC MATERIAL, PARTICULARLY FOR MEASURING THE THICKNESS OF A WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa NDT GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 3 50354 Hürth / DE | For all designated states Renzel, Peter Münsterweg 12 52355 Düren-Birgel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Agfa NDT GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 3 D-50354 Hürth / DE | ||
For all designated states Renzel, Peter Münsterweg 12 52355 Düren-Birgel / DE | |||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Agfa NDT GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 3 D-50354 Hürth / DE | ||
For all designated states Renyel, Peter Münsterweg 12 52355 D ren-Birgel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENZEL, Peter Münsterweg 12 52355 Düren-Birgel / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Lindenallee 43 50968 Köln-Marienburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03787614.1 | 27.06.2003 | WO2003DE02150 | Priority number, date | DE2002132475 | 17.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10232475 | DE2003127102 | 12.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10327102 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004017021 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1525430 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525430 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01B17/02 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G01N29/041 (EP,US);
G01B17/025 (EP,US);
G01N29/07 (EP,US);
G01N29/4472 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0421 (EP,US);
G01N2291/057 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER SCHALLGESCHWINDIGKEIT IN EINEM BASISMATERIAL, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE WANDDICKENMESSUNG | [2005/17] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SOUND VELOCITY IN A BASIC MATERIAL, PARTICULARLY FOR MEASURING THE THICKNESS OF A WALL | [2005/17] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER LA VITESSE DU SON DANS UN MATERIAU DE BASE, EN PARTICULIER POUR MESURER UNE EPAISSEUR DE PAROI | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 13.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | AT | 27.06.2011 | LU | 27.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US6035717 (CARODISKEY THOMAS J [US]) [AD] 1-6 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5894092 (LINDGREN ERIC A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 59 - column 10, line 46; figures 1-3 * | [A] - LAKESTANI FERODOUN ET AL., "Application of ultrasonic Rayleigh waves to thickness measurement of metallic coatings", NDT&E INTERNATIONAL, (1995), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 171 - 178, XP001179436 [A] 1-6 * page 175 - page 178 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0963-8695(95)00010-U | [A] - COSTE J.F. ET AL., "Non-Destructive thickness determination of metallic coatings using ultrasonic Rayleigh waves", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, (1996), vol. 210-213, pages 335 - 342, XP009025690 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |