EP1547160 - NANO-POROUS METAL OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR SPECTRALLY SENSITIZED WITH METAL CHALCOGENIDE NANO-PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRIESSEN, Hieronymus, Agfa-Gevaert Corporate IP Department 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [2005/26] | Application number, filing date | 03787809.7 | 29.07.2003 | WO2003EP50346 | Priority number, date | EP20020102130 | 13.08.2002 Original published format: EP 02102130 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004017427 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1547160 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/072, H01L31/0352 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H01L31/035281 (EP);
H01G9/2031 (EP);
H01M14/005 (EP);
Y02E10/542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/48] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTRAL MIT METALLKALKOGENIDNANOPARTIKELN SENSIBILISIERTER NANOPORÖSER METALLOXIDHALBLEITER | [2005/26] | English: | NANO-POROUS METAL OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR SPECTRALLY SENSITIZED WITH METAL CHALCOGENIDE NANO-PARTICLES | [2005/26] | French: | SEMICONDUCTEUR A OXYDE METALLIQUE NANOPOREUX SPECTRALEMENT SENSIBILISE A L'AIDE DE NANOPARTICULES DE CHALCOGENURE METALLIQUE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1176646 (ECOLE POLYTECH) [AD] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A] - SIEBENTRITT S ET AL, "CdTe and CdS as extremely thin absorber materials in an eta solar cell", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (19970630), pages 1823 - 1826, XP002110737 [A] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * the whole document * | [AD] - VOGEL R ET AL, "QUANTUM-SIZED PBS, CDS, AG2S, AND BI2S3 PARTICLES AS SENSITIZERS FOR VARIOUS NANOPOROUS WIDE-BANDGAP SEMICONDUCTORS", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (1994), vol. 98, no. 12, ISSN 0022-3654, pages 3183 - 3188, XP000956096 [AD] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j100063a022 | [A] - ERNST K ET AL, "Contacts to a solar cell with extremely thin CdTe absorber", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20010529), vol. 387, no. 1-2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 26 - 28, XP004232902 [A] 1,2,4,8,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(00)01731-4 | [A] - KOENENKAMP R ET AL, "HETEROJUNCTION AND DEVICES OF COLLOIDAL SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS AND QUANTUM DOTS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 79, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 7029 - 7035, XP000885269 [A] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.361469 | [A] - NASR C ET AL, "PHOTOELECTROCHEMICAL BEHAVIOR OF COMPOSITE SEMICONDUCTOR THIN FILMSAND THEIR SENSITIZATION WITH RUTHENIUM POLYPYRIDYL COMPLEX", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON PHOTOELECTROCHEMISTRY. PARIS, AUG. 31 - SEPT. 5, 1997, PENNINGTON, NJ, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOC, US, (19990721), vol. PV 97-20, ISBN 1-56677-148-X, pages 130 - 140, XP000792149 |