EP1534575 - A VEHICLE, METHOD AND STEERING SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2008/15] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Volvo Lastvagnar AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDMARK, Andreas Godhemsgatan 60B S-414 68 Göteborg / SE | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Fröhling, Werner Volvo Technology Corporation, Corporate Patents, 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03788203.2 | 07.08.2003 | WO2003SE01255 | Priority number, date | SE20020002423 | 14.08.2002 Original published format: SE 0202423 | [2005/22] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004016493 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534575 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534575 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, B62D5/14, B62D7/06 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
B60G7/008 (EP,US);
B62D5/0418 (EP,US);
B62D7/18 (EP,US);
B60G2200/1322 (EP,US);
B60G2200/44 (EP,US);
B60G2204/143 (EP,US);
B60G2204/148 (EP,US);
B60G2204/15 (EP,US);
B60G2206/50 (EP,US);
B60G2206/602 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN UND LENKSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2005/22] | English: | A VEHICLE, METHOD AND STEERING SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2005/22] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIRECTION DE VEHICULE ET PROCEDE | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2003 | Translation filed | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | BE | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | IE | 07.08.2008 | LU | 07.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 09.04.2008 | |
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 09.04.2008 | |
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2400868 (LE TOURNEAU ROBERT G); | [Y]US4714140 (HATTON JOHN H [US], et al); | [Y]US4798394 (POLLOCK PAUL R [US], et al); | [Y]EP0334691 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) |